Global Patent Index - EP 0940788 A3

EP 0940788 A3 2000-08-02 - Detector

Title (en)

Detector

Title (de)

Melder

Title (fr)

Détecteur

Publication

EP 0940788 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98117539 A

Priority

DE 19808872 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940788A2] The fire alarm has an externally visible light indicator with one or more wreath-shaped light surfaces (7) on the part of the alarm surface that can be seen. The light surfaces radiate in different directions. The light indicator can contain one or more light conductors that carry light from the light source to the light surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 7/06 (2006.01); G08B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 7/06 (2013.01); G08B 17/10 (2013.01); G08B 17/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] DE 3806217 A1 19890907 - SCHUNK METALL & KUNSTSTOFF [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940788 A2 19990908; EP 0940788 A3 20000802; EP 0940788 B1 20020724; DE 19808872 A1 19990909

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-12-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804880 20020829

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 17/10 A, 7G 08B 7/06 B, 7G 08B 5/36 B

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI