Global patent index - EP 0940793 A3

EP 0940793 A3 2000-09-06 - Device triggered by vehicles

Title (en)

Device triggered by vehicles

Title (de)

Auf Fahrzeuge ansprechende Weckvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Appareil déclenché par véhicule

Publication

EP 0940793 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103250 A

Priority

DE 19809059 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940793A2] The alarm responds to sounds made by motor vehicles and generates a signal indicating their presence. It contains at least one sensor (10) for receiving the vehicle noise and a signal processor (11) with at least two separate channels (111, 112) with a bandpass filter (20, 21), rectifier and integrator (25, 26). The parameters of one channel are tuned to the vehicle noise. Those of the other channel are tuned to event noise partially overlapping the vehicle noise, e.g. gusts of wind. Decision logic (18, 19) is fed back to an estimation filter (16, 17) in the first channel to influence its operation, parameters and decision thresholds. Alarm logic (20) generates the alarm signal using the degree of confidence output by the decision logic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940793 A2 19990908; EP 0940793 A3 20000906; DE 19809059 A1 19990909; DE 19809059 C2 20011018

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030819

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08G 1/04 A, 7G 01V 1/00 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI