Global Patent Index - EP 0940829 A3

EP 0940829 A3 2000-05-03 - Electrical multilayer contactprofile

Title (en)

Electrical multilayer contactprofile

Title (de)

Elektrisches Mehrlagen-Kontaktprofil

Title (fr)

Profile de contact électric à multi-couche

Publication

EP 0940829 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100486 A

Priority

DE 19809450 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0940829A2] The contact piece has a carrier (4) on which a lower contact layer (3) is formed, and at least one additional contact layer is arranged on the lower contact layer. The lower contact layer lies completely sealed on the carrier. A boundary layer (6) made of an iron-free metal alloy is arranged between the additional contact layers and the carrier.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/02 (2006.01); H01H 1/023 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/02 (2013.01); H01H 1/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0940829 A2 19990908; EP 0940829 A3 20000503; DE 19809450 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001104

2001-02-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI