Global patent index - EP 0940887 A3

EP 0940887 A3 2000-01-19 - Floating connector for interconnecting electrical devices

Title (en)

Floating connector for interconnecting electrical devices

Title (de)

Schwimmend gelagerter Verbinder zum Verbinden elektrischer Baugruppen

Title (fr)

Connecteur flottant d'interconnexion des assemblages électriques

Publication

EP 0940887 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124155 A

Priority

DE 19804453 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804453A1] The connector (8) is mounted in a first assembly (5) in a stiff casing to float in a direction transverse to the plugging direction (A) or in a second direction transverse to the first direction and to the plugging direction or about a pivot axis transverse to the plugging direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/631; H01R 23/70; H01R 31/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/71 (2011.01); H01R 13/631 (2006.01); H01R 13/73 (2006.01); H01R 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 31/06 (2013.01); H01R 12/728 (2013.01); H01R 13/6315 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19804453 A1 19990812; BR 9900533 A 19991228; EP 0940887 A2 19990908; EP 0940887 A3 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040702

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO SCHALTER UND SENSOREN GMBH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1999-09-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI