Global patent index - EP 0941086 A4

EP 0941086 A4 2000-07-12 - NITROSATED AND NITROSYLATED PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USES

Title (en)

NITROSATED AND NITROSYLATED PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITOR COMPOUNDS, COMPOSITIONS AND THEIR USES

Title (de)

NITROSIERTE UND NITROSYLIERTE PHOSPHODIESTERASE HEMMENDE VERBINDUNGEN, ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES NITROSES ET NITROSYLES INHIBITEURS DE LA PHOSPHODIESTERASE, COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT CES COMPOSES ET UTILISATIONS CORRESPONDANTES

Publication

EP 0941086 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97946871 A

Priority

  • US 9719870 W
  • US 74076496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819672A1] Disclosed are nitrosated and/or nitrosylated phosphodiesterase inhibitors having the formula NOn-PDE inhibitor wherein n is 1 or 2. The phosphodiesterase inhibitor can be nitrosylated or nitrosated through sites such as oxygen (hydroxyl condensation), sulfur (sulfhydryl condensation), carbon and nitrogen. The invention also provides compositions comprising such compounds in a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier. The invention also provides a composition comprising a therapeutically effective amount of a phosphodiesterase inhibitor (PDE inhibitor), which can optionally be substituted with at least one NO or NO2 moiety, and one to ten fold molar excess of a compound that donates, transfers or releases nitrogen monoxide as a charged species, i.e., nitrosonium (NO<+>) or nitroxyl (NO<->), or as the neutral species, nitric oxide (NO<.>) or which stimulates endogenous EDRF production. The invention also provides compositions comprising such compounds in a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier. The invention also provides a method for treating male impotence in humans by administering the compounds and compositions thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/165; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/40; A61K 31/415; A61K 31/425; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/47; A61K 31/50; A61K 31/505; A61K 31/52; C07D 207/24; C07D 405/14; C07D 473/30; C07D 487/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 473/30 (2006.01); A61K 31/4015 (2006.01); A61K 31/4188 (2006.01); A61K 31/4375 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/454 (2006.01); A61K 31/4745 (2006.01); A61K 31/4985 (2006.01); A61K 31/501 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61K 31/52 (2006.01); A61K 31/522 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); C07D 207/12 (2006.01); C07D 213/89 (2006.01); C07D 215/227 (2006.01); C07D 237/04 (2006.01); C07D 277/22 (2006.01); C07D 279/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/02 (2006.01); C07D 401/04 (2006.01); C07D 401/06 (2006.01); C07D 401/10 (2006.01); C07D 403/04 (2006.01); C07D 403/10 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01); C07D 471/14 (2006.01); C07D 487/04 (2006.01); C07D 487/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 487/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XP] WO 9739760 A1 19971030 - UNIV KINGSTON [CA], et al
  • [XP] WO 9734871 A1 19970925 - NITROMED INC [US], et al
  • [Y] WO 9312068 A1 19930624 - BRIGHAM & WOMENS HOSPITAL [US] & US 5380758 A 19950110 - STAMLER JONATHAN [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9509636 A1 19950413 - UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0506194 A1 19920930 - AKZO NV [NL]
  • [A] EP 0442204 A2 19910821 - SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]
  • [A] EP 0252721 A1 19880113 - ORTHO PHARMA CORP [US]
  • [A] EP 0352960 A2 19900131 - SMITH KLINE FRENCH LAB [GB]
  • [A] WO 9625184 A1 19960822 - GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]
  • [A] EP 0463756 A1 19920102 - PFIZER LTD [GB], et al
  • [Y] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 120, no. 1, 3 January 1994, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 5451d, XP002107375 & AM. J. PHYSIOL., vol. 265, no. 3(1), 1993, pages G418 - G422AM. J. PHYSIOL.19932653(1)G418G422
  • [A] BOOLELL M ET AL: "SILDENAFIL, A NOVEL EFFECTIVE ORAL THERAPY FOR MALE ERECTILE DYSFUNCTION", BRITISH JOURNAL OF UROLOGY,GB,EDINBURGH, vol. 78, no. 2, 1996, pages 257-261, XP000853934
  • [AP] MARTEL A M ET AL: "Sildenafil", DRUGS OF THE FUTURE,ES,BARCELONA, vol. 22, no. 2, 1997, pages 138-143, XP002090616, ISSN: 0377-8282
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 125, no. 15, 7 October 1996, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 191382, XP002127106 & J. DE VENTE ET AL., J. CHEM. NEUROANAT., vol. 10, no. 3,4, 1996, pages 241 - 248J. DE VENTE ET AL.J. CHEM. NEUROANAT.1996103,4241248
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 123, no. 1, 3 July 1995, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 574, XP002127107 & F. ICHINOSE ET AL., J. APPL. PHYSIOL., vol. 78, no. 4, 1995, pages 1288 - 1295F. ICHINOSE ET AL.J. APPL. PHYSIOL.199578412881295
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 120, no. 25, 20 June 1994, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 315630, XP002127108 & A.J.M. BARBIER ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., vol. 111, no. 4, 1994, pages 1280 - 1286A.J.M. BARBIER ET AL.BR. J. PHARMACOL.1994111412801286
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 121, no. 7, 15 August 1994, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 73410, XP002127109 & N.A. ALLEN ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., vol. 112, no. 2, 1994, pages 423 - 428N.A. ALLEN ET AL.BR. J. PHARMACOL.19941122423428
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 116, no. 1, 6 January 1992, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 4477, XP002127110 & M.W. RADOMSKI ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 51, no. 22, 1991, pages 6073 - 6078M.W. RADOMSKI ET AL.CANCER RES.1991512260736078
  • See also references of WO 9819672A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819672 A1 19980514; AU 5196298 A 19980529; AU 722480 B2 20000803; CA 2270118 A1 19980514; EP 0941086 A1 19990915; EP 0941086 A4 20000712; JP 2001504457 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2010-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20100504

2006-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010122

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-07-12 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/165 A, 7A 61K 31/38 B, 7A 61K 31/40 B, 7A 61K 31/415 B, 7A 61K 31/425 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/47 B, 7A 61K 31/50 B, 7A 61K 31/505 B, 7C 07D 207/24 B, 7A 61K 31/52 B, 7C 07D 473/30 B, 7C 07D 487/04 B, 7C 07D 405/14 B, 7C 07D 487/04 J, 7C 07D 239:00 J, 7C 07D 239:00 J

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990428

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE