Global Patent Index - EP 0941111 A4

EP 0941111 A4 2000-09-27 - HEPATOCYTE GROWTH FACTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (en)

HEPATOCYTE GROWTH FACTOR ANTAGONISTS

Title (de)

WACHSTUMSFAKTOR-ANTAGONISTEN VON HEPATOZYTEN

Title (fr)

ANTAGONISTES DU FACTEUR DE CROISSANCE HEPATOCYTAIRE

Publication

EP 0941111 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97948148 A

Priority

  • US 9719891 W
  • US 3034296 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9819696A1] A method of treating a human having chronic renal disease is provided comprising administering a hepatocyte growth factor antagonist to the human.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/18; C12Q 1/68; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 13/12 (2006.01); C07K 16/22 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/502 (2013.01); A61K 38/1833 (2013.01); G01N 33/5008 (2013.01); G01N 33/5044 (2013.01); G01N 33/5088 (2013.01); G01N 2500/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] WO 9205184 A1 19920402 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [AD] WO 9406909 A2 19940331 - US HEALTH [US]
  • [X] KOLATSI-JOANNOU MARIA ET AL: "The hepatocyte growth factor/scatter factor (HGF/SF) receptor, met, transduces a morphogenetic signal in renal glomerular fibromuscular mesangial cells.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, vol. 108, no. 12, 1995, pages 3703 - 3714, XP002143658, ISSN: 0021-9533
  • [A] BORDER W A ET AL: "SUPPRESSION OF EXPERIMENTAL GLOMERULONEPHRITIS BY ANTISERUM AGAINSTTRANSFORMING GROWTH FACTOR BETA1", NATURE, 26 July 1990 (1990-07-26), XP002025313
  • See also references of WO 9819696A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9819696 A1 19980514; CA 2270867 A1 19980514; EP 0941111 A1 19990915; EP 0941111 A4 20000927; JP 2001505995 A 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1022637

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-04-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011017

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-09-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-09-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/18 A, 7G 01N 33/53 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990512

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL