Global Patent Index - EP 0941154 B1

EP 0941154 B1 2002-11-20 - KNIFE-HOLDER WITH ADJUSTABLE CIRCULAR KNIFE

Title (en)

KNIFE-HOLDER WITH ADJUSTABLE CIRCULAR KNIFE

Title (de)

MESSERHALTER MIT ANSTELLBAREM KREISMESSER

Title (fr)

GUIDE-LAME A COUTEAU CIRCULAIRE REGLABLE

Publication

EP 0941154 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98952643 A

Priority

  • DE 29717396 U
  • EP 9806094 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9916594A1] The invention relates to a knife-holder (1) for circular knives (2) for longitudinally dividing lines of material. Said knife-holder has a base (3) which can be connected to a cutter bar, at least one moveable guiding rod (7) being allocated to said base (3). Said guiding rod (7) is connected to an actuating drive at one end and is connected by its other end to a swivel arm (30) via a joint. A knife head (17) with a circular knife is located on the swivel arm (30), said circular knife being arranged in such a way that it can rotate. The swivel arm (30) is also connected to an activating means (21).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 5/04; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/04 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/04 (2013.01); B26D 7/2621 (2013.01); B26D 1/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29717396 U1 19990128; DE 19881393 D2 20000316; EP 0941154 A1 19990915; EP 0941154 B1 20021120; WO 9916594 A1 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2004-09-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030924

2003-09-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030918

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806354 20030102

2002-12-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020219

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT