Global Patent Index - EP 0941161 B1

EP 0941161 B1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR PRINTING OBJECTS WITH COLOUR MOTIFS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRINTING OBJECTS WITH COLOUR MOTIFS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEDRUCKEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN MIT FARBIGEN MOTIVEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'IMPRESSION DE MOTIFS COLORES SUR DES OBJETS

Publication

EP 0941161 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97949966 A

Priority

  • DE 9702777 W
  • DE 19649545 A
  • DE 19649546 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9823453A1] The invention relates to a method for the simple and lasting transfer of colour motifs with all shades of colour onto candles or other wax-like objects, for e.g. plates for the production of wax images, as well as the simple, lasting and, in particular, dish-washer proof transfer of coloured motifs with all shades of colour onto objects made of ceramics, but also of porcelain, glass, aluminium, metal, tin, wood or synthetic materials, and objects which have been printed in accordance with this method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B44C 1/17; C11C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 1/34 (2006.01); B41M 1/40 (2006.01); B41M 5/025 (2006.01); B41M 5/035 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01); B41M 1/26 (2006.01); B41M 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B44C 1/1712 (2013.01); B41M 5/035 (2013.01); B41M 5/0256 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9823453 A1 19980604; AT 199685 T 20010315; AU 5309198 A 19980622; EP 0941161 A1 19990915; EP 0941161 B1 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060507

2005-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2004-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041127

2003-12-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BUBECK OLIVER

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-02-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GROVAG GROSSVENTILTECHNIK AG

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-14 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-08-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HUG INTERLIZENZ AG

2001-06-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703156 20010419

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199685 T 20010315

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991001

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990622

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE