Global Patent Index - EP 0941191 B1

EP 0941191 B1 2000-07-26 - ROLLING MECHANISM FOR RAIL VEHICLE

Title (en)

ROLLING MECHANISM FOR RAIL VEHICLE

Title (de)

FAHRWERK FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE ROULEMENT POUR VEHICULE FERROVIAIRE

Publication

EP 0941191 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945664 A

Priority

  • AT 9700270 W
  • AT 213196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824675A1] The invention relates to a rolling mechanism for a rail vehicle with at least two pairs of wheels (12-15) arranged opposite each other and at right angle to the direction of travel, and rigidly connected with each other by means of one axle each (10, 11). To improve riding properties, lower wear on the axles and rails, permit the raising of vehicle weight and simultaneously create a compact structure, the sliding tracks (16-19) of two wheels (12-15) of one pair located behind each other in the direction of travel are arranged on a common lateral axle (S) in the rolling mechanism frame (5) and controlled desmodromically by a symmetrical control system. This type of rolling mechanism is fitted to a rail vehicle consisting of at least two carriages, which allows for the creation of maximum passenger space and for carriages to be connected by a passageway as short as possible with a low-level floor, whereby the bodies of adjoining carriages are supported on the opposite ends of the frame of the rolling mechanism.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/32; B61C 9/52; B61F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/52 (2006.01); B61F 3/12 (2006.01); B61F 5/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61C 9/52 (2013.01); B61F 3/125 (2013.01); B61F 5/325 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824675 A1 19980611; AT 194948 T 20000815; AT 405734 B 19991125; AT A213196 A 19990315; AU 5110398 A 19980629; DE 59702091 D1 20000831; EP 0941191 A1 19990915; EP 0941191 B1 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071203

2007-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001203

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702091 20000831

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 194948 T 20000815

1999-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991115

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990522

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT