Global Patent Index - EP 0941403 B1

EP 0941403 B1 2001-12-19 - AXIAL PISTON MOTOR WITH BEARING FLUSHING

Title (en)

AXIAL PISTON MOTOR WITH BEARING FLUSHING

Title (de)

AXIALKOLBENMASCHINE MIT LAGERSPÜLUNG

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A PISTONS AXIAUX A RIN AGE DES PALIERS

Publication

EP 0941403 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948792 A

Priority

  • DE 19649195 A
  • EP 9705870 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19649195C1] The invention relates to an axial piston motor constructed as a swivel-slide structure with a channel to feed cleaning fluid to the driving shaft bearings. The axial piston motor (1) comprises a swivelling cylinder drum (8) and a driving shaft (3) supported on driving shaft bearings (4, 5). The driving shaft (3) is connected to a driving shaft flange (6) to which movable pistons (11, 12) are coupled through the cylinder bores (9, 10) of the cylinder drum (8), and on which the cylinder drum (8) is supported by a central journal (16). In addition, the invention provides for a control specular element (18) with reniform control elements and a regulating device (26), by which the cylinder drum (8) together with the control specular element (18) can be swivelled. According to the improvement added by the invention, the cleaning fluid channel is taken through the setting journal (25) and control specular element (18) up to the central journal (16). The cleaning fluid channel then continues inside the central journal (16) and the driving shaft (3) and exits at the driving shaft bearings (4, 5) that require feeding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20; F04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01); F04B 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2014 (2013.01); F04B 1/328 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649195 C1 19980108; EP 0941403 A1 19990915; EP 0941403 B1 20011219; US 6279452 B1 20010828; WO 9823860 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131023

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59705918

- Effective date: 20140501

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20121023

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081024

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071012

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705918 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981119

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE