Global Patent Index - EP 0941527 B1

EP 0941527 B1 2001-04-04 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GUIDING STREAMS OF PEOPLE IN MEANS OF MASS TRANSPORTATION

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GUIDING STREAMS OF PEOPLE IN MEANS OF MASS TRANSPORTATION

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LEITEN VON PERSONENSTRÖMEN BEI MASSENVERKEHRSMITTELN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET METHODE POUR GUIDER DES FLOTS DE GENS DANS DES MOYENS DE TRANSPORT EN COMMUN

Publication

EP 0941527 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952003 A

Priority

  • DE 19649280 A
  • EP 9706645 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19649280A1] Device for guiding flows of individuals in mass transportation systems, containing at least the following components: A) a guidance system in embarking and disembarking areas interacting with at least one of the following devices: a) a guidance system in the means of transportation, b) a blocking device between the embarking/disembarking areas and the means of transportation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 5/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 25/02 (2006.01); B61B 1/02 (2006.01); G08G 1/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/005 (2013.01); B61B 1/02 (2013.01); B61L 15/0072 (2013.01); B61L 15/009 (2013.01); B61L 27/0077 (2013.01); E05F 15/00 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/822 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/404 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649280 A1 19980604; DE 19649280 B4 20040129; AT 200359 T 20010415; AU 5557798 A 19980622; CA 2273230 A1 19980604; CA 2273230 C 20080826; EP 0941527 A1 19990915; EP 0941527 B1 20010404; ES 2156409 T3 20010616; HK 1024770 A1 20020222; JP 2001510416 A 20010731; JP 3878221 B2 20070207; US 6741175 B1 20040525; WO 9824072 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151130

2016-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59703313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131129

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20150407

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-28 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-11-07 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

- Effective date: 20141007

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 200359

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RAUCH, JUERGEN

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156409

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-06-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59703313

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-10

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BUECHEL, KAMINSKI & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE EST

2001-04-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-04-12 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200359

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 08B 5/36 A

2000-05-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR GUIDING STREAMS OF PEOPLE IN MEANS OF MASS TRANSPORTATION

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991203

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990525

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI