Global Patent Index - EP 0941549 B1

EP 0941549 B1 2001-05-09 - SAFETY SWITCH

Title (en)

SAFETY SWITCH

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSSCHALTER

Title (fr)

INTERRUPTEUR DE SECURITE

Publication

EP 0941549 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951250 A

Priority

  • DE 19649717 A
  • EP 9706478 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19649717A1] The safety switch includes a switch casing (1), at least one key channel (3, 5) in the switch casing, in which a key (7) is insertable from the exterior, and a control disk (9) which projects into the key channel, and which is rotated at insertion of the key, whereby devices (15, 19, 25) are provided for a fixture of the control disk at completely inserted key. The devices for the fixture of the control disk consist preferably of at least one extrusion (19) on the control disk, which engages with a locking element (25) which is movable with respect to the control disk. -

[origin: DE19649717A1] The invention concerns a safety switch with a switch housing comprising at least one key channel into which a key (7) can be introduced from the exterior, and a plate cam which projects into the key channel and rotates when the key (7) is introduced. In addition, means (15, 19, 25) are provided for securing the plate cam when the key (7) has been fully introduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 3/42 (2006.01); H01H 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 27/002 (2013.01); H01H 2027/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649717 A1 19980604; AT 201115 T 20010515; AT 231649 T 20030215; EP 0941549 A1 19990915; EP 0941549 B1 20010509; EP 0982747 A2 20000301; EP 0982747 A3 20001122; EP 0982747 B1 20030122; EP 1077457 A2 20010221; EP 1077457 A3 20010314; EP 1077457 B1 20021211; JP 2001504981 A 20010410; US 6084185 A 20000704; WO 9825284 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161120

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161120

2017-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161121

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161120

2017-07-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59703519

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59703519

- Representative's name: RUCKH, RAINER, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EUCHNER G.M.B.H. + CO.

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG * ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703519 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201115 T 20010515

2000-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000621

1999-09-22 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990413

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE