Global Patent Index - EP 0941562 B1

EP 0941562 B1 2001-01-17 - DOUBLE-LOCK CONNECTOR

Title (en)

DOUBLE-LOCK CONNECTOR

Title (de)

STECKVERBINDER MIT DOPPELTER VERRIEGELUNG

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR A VERROUILLAGE DOUBLE

Publication

EP 0941562 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97946952 A

Priority

  • JP 33045796 A
  • US 9721498 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824150A1] A double-lock connector includes a double-lock member, which can be used for locking the contacts in contact cavities arranged in a staggered pattern and which provides for a smooth operation when the double-lock member is shifted from a temporary-latched position to a fully-latched position. The double-lock member (50) has two elongated arms (51a, 51b) which can slide along the outer surfaces of side walls of an inner housing (20). Along the elongated arms (51a, 51b), locking members (60) are provided, which are arranged at fixed intervals in a longitudinal direction and facing inside. The cross section of the locking members (60) is of an L-shaped configuration and they lock electrical contacts (100) in contact cavities (30) when the double-lock member is in the fully-latched position. Along outside surfaces of the housing (20), grooves (28) of L-shaped cross section are formed into which the latching members (60) are disposed. Due to the fact that the latching members (60) are disposed within the grooves (28), the arms (51a, 51b) are retained against outer surfaces of side walls of the inner housing (20) when the double-lock member (50) is moved therealong.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/42 (2006.01); H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4362 (2013.01); H01R 13/62911 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824150 A1 19980604; AU 5202898 A 19980622; DE 69703939 D1 20010222; DE 69703939 T2 20010613; EP 0941562 A1 19990915; EP 0941562 B1 20010117; JP 3268988 B2 20020325; JP H10162890 A 19980619

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091120

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091120

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-03-26 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20021102

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: LEOPOLD KOSTAL GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-02-22

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991118

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB