Global Patent Index - EP 0941675 B1

EP 0941675 B1 2002-09-25 - Ski boot

Title (en)

Ski boot

Title (de)

Skischuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de ski alpin

Publication

EP 0941675 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99810164 A

Priority

CH 61798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941675A1] The ski boot consists of a supple upper (1) and a reinforced supporting cradle (2) which has a triangulated structure (14) in the ankle region and rear (8) and front (10) ridges to receive the ski fastenings. The supporting cradle has a partially open sole and sides, and is fixed to the upper by an injected plastic material (20) with shock absorbing properties which passes through the holes of the open sections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2013.01); A43B 5/047 (2013.01); A43B 5/0482 (2013.01); A43B 5/0486 (2013.01); A43B 5/0488 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0941675 A1 19990915; EP 0941675 B1 20020925; CH 692012 A5 20020115; DE 69903081 D1 20021031; DE 69903081 T2 20030528; US 6021589 A 20000208

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080224

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080225

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070611

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903081 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011213

2000-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990607

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI