Global patent index - EP 0941687 A3

EP 0941687 A3 2000-06-07 - Shower booth

Title (en)

Shower booth

Title (de)

Duschkabine

Title (fr)

Cabine de douche

Publication

EP 0941687 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103376 A

Priority

DE 29803970 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941687A2] The cubicle is constructed from panels (18,19) attached to at least one wall post (15,16) that can be mounted in the wall (12,13) of the room in which the cubicle is located. The wall side of the post has a vertical support frame (24,25) that can be mounted in the wall. A vertical non-supporting first removable panel (26,27) is fitted on the inside of the cubicle. At least one second removable panel with a different colour, shape or function than the first panel is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/22; E03C 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/28 (2006.01); E03C 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/28 (2013.01); E03C 1/0408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29803970 U1 19980423; EP 0941687 A2 19990915; EP 0941687 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status

2006-03-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 47K 3/28 A

2005-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7E 03C 1/06 B

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021227

2001-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 47K 3/22 A, 7E 03C 1/06 B

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL PT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI