Global Patent Index - EP 0941771 A3

EP 0941771 A3 2000-06-07 - Wall segment for a cabin construction

Title (en)

Wall segment for a cabin construction

Title (de)

Wandsegment für eine Kabinenkonstruktion

Title (fr)

Segment de mur pour la construction d'une cabine

Publication

EP 0941771 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104505 A

Priority

DE 19811036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941771A2] A demountable wall panel for assembling into a paint spray booth or similar lightweight structure has an elastic sealing frame (134) fitted around the edges of the panel. This enables the panel to be sealed into the support structure without adhesive/sealant. It also allows the panels to be removed and replaced without having to remove adhesive. The sealing frame can be made in one assembly with the panel or it can be applied to the panel using double sided adhesive tape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/12 (2006.01); B05B 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/1214 (2013.01); B05B 13/0452 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0941771 A2 19990915; EP 0941771 A3 20000607; DE 19811036 A1 19991014; DE 19811036 B4 20061123

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI