Global Patent Index - EP 0941817 B1

EP 0941817 B1 2003-06-11 - Cutting machine for the automated trimming of printed products, like brochures, magazines or books

Title (en)

Cutting machine for the automated trimming of printed products, like brochures, magazines or books

Title (de)

Schneidmaschine zum selbsttätigen Beschneiden von Druckerzeugnissen wie Broschuren, Zeitschriften oder Büchern

Title (fr)

Machine pour le rognage automatique de produits imprimés, tels des brochures, des magazines ou des livres

Publication

EP 0941817 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810207 A

Priority

EP 98810207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941817A1] The knives (2,6) move up and down together and each possess a pressure bar (3). Each of the two cutter units (A,B), spaced apart in the direction of travel (5), have adjustable thrust pieces (40,41) for the printed products (21) which are conveyed spine-first. At least one of the knives is for cutting the front or top and bottom. The printed products are conveyed by conveyors (7) from the first to the second cutter unit. The conveyor section and cutter part are adaptable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 1/09; B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/01 (2006.01); B26D 1/08 (2006.01); B26D 1/09 (2006.01); B26D 7/06 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B42C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/09 (2013.01); B26D 7/0675 (2013.01); B26D 7/2628 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0081 (2013.01); Y10S 83/934 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4556 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4577 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4612 (2015.04); Y10T 83/7647 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0941817 A1 19990915; EP 0941817 B1 20030611; DE 59808690 D1 20030717; JP 2000071195 A 20000307; JP 4383573 B2 20091216; US 6536319 B1 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160311

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160311

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160311

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808690

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808690 P 20030717

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011017

2000-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI