Global Patent Index - EP 0941827 A3

EP 0941827 A3 2001-02-28 - Apparatus for on-site production of pumpable mortars

Title (en)

Apparatus for on-site production of pumpable mortars

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur baustellenseitigen Herstellung von pumpfähigen Mörtelmassen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la production sur place des mortiers susceptibles d'être pompés

Publication

EP 0941827 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123593 A

Priority

DE 29804459 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941827A2] The arrangement consists of a trough (15) for the infeed of the dry component of the mixture which is fed-in via a connection (14) from e.g. a silo (13). An upward leading de-airing pipe (18) is connected to the trough. The de-airing pipe incorporates a tube (19) made from a flexible material, the open end of which has a number of longitudinal slits which fold inward to close the tube when there is a sudden increase in the speed of airflow from the trough. As the tube closes, concrete dust is prevented from being blown into the environment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/12; B28C 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/12 (2006.01); B28C 7/00 (2006.01); E04G 21/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 7/0076 (2013.01); B01F 7/00708 (2013.01); B28C 5/1292 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804459 U1 19980813; CZ 9063 U1 19991117; EP 0941827 A2 19990915; EP 0941827 A3 20010228; PL 109152 U1 19990913

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010829

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 28C 5/12 A, 7B 28C 7/00 B

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI