Global Patent Index - EP 0941835 A3

EP 0941835 A3 2000-09-27 - Heating device for a corrugating system

Title (en)

Heating device for a corrugating system

Title (de)

Heizvorrichtung für eine Wellpappenanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chauffage pour un système de fabrication de carton ondulé

Publication

EP 0941835 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103204 A

Priority

DE 19810841 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941835A2] The heating plates (3) are positioned one behind the other and have pressure elements (4) over them and exerting pressure on the length of corrugated cardboard (2). At the start of the heating plates, between at least one part of the corrugated cardboard web and at least one pressure element (4.1,4.2) is a feed belt in the form of a conveyor belt (10) running over at least two spaced apart deflector rollers (11,12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/2881 (2013.01); B31F 1/285 (2013.01); Y10T 156/1025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0941835 A2 19990915; EP 0941835 A3 20000927; EP 0941835 B1 20011024; DE 19810841 A1 19990923; DE 19810841 C2 20020314; US 6129654 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100218

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100218

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-10-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020123

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900333 20011129

2001-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI