Global Patent Index - EP 0941847 B1

EP 0941847 B1 2002-12-18 - Ink metering device and method in offset printing machines

Title (en)

Ink metering device and method in offset printing machines

Title (de)

Einrichtung und Verfahren für das Dosieren von Farbe in Offsetdruckmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de dosage de l'encre dans des machines à imprimer offset

Publication

EP 0941847 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99101505 A

Priority

  • US 3901198 A
  • US 14092898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0941847A1] An ink feed system for an offset printing process has a constant pressure ink reservoir (5) which supplies ink to a dosing slit (8) and onto an ink roller (2). The position of the ink supply head (4) is adjusted by a cam (14) and a servo drive (16,17) to vary the spacing of the ink head from the roller. A spreader blade (9) on the ink head spreads the applied ink into an even controlled thickness layer. The spreader blade ensures that any non uniformity in the ink feed is compensated by the blade

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/02; B41F 31/04; B41F 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/04 (2006.01); B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/08 (2013.01); B41F 31/027 (2013.01); B41F 31/045 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0607574 B1 19960501 - FIT GROUP INC [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0941847 A1 19990915; EP 0941847 B1 20021218; DE 19903167 A1 19990916; DE 59903796 D1 20030130; JP H11291460 A 19991026; US 6076463 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903796

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-11-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-06-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021218

2003-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030130

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903796 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903796 P 20030130

2002-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010517

2000-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-11-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI