Global Patent Index - EP 0941927 A3

EP 0941927 A3 2000-04-12 - Packaging machine

Title (en)

Packaging machine

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage

Publication

EP 0941927 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108893 A

Priority

  • DE 19618559 A
  • EP 97106684 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0806346A2] The packing machine packs objects (4) in foil (5). It has a device (1) to form a hose (6) from the originally flat foil, and a transporting device to carry the objects into the hose. The hose forming device has several pair of form edges (12,17,18) to turn the foil. The form edges are arranged relative to each other so that the path over the form edges along lines parallel to the edges of the foil from the input of the foil into the hose forming device to its output from it in the edge region of the foil is shorter than in the middle of the foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/06 (2012.01); B65B 57/12 (2006.01); B65B 59/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 59/02 (2013.01); B65B 9/06 (2013.01); B65B 57/12 (2013.01); B65B 2009/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0806346 A2 19971112; EP 0806346 A3 19980909; EP 0806346 B1 19990818; DE 19618559 A1 19971113; EP 0941927 A2 19990915; EP 0941927 A3 20000412; ES 2138412 T3 20000101; US 5799470 A 19980901

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-03-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PACKAGING MACHINE

1999-09-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 806346

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE