Global patent index - EP 0942080 A3

EP 0942080 A3 2001-01-17 - Machine for lap-forming

Title (en)

Machine for lap-forming

Title (de)

Maschine zum Bilden von Wattewickeln

Title (fr)

Machine pour former des enroulements de nappes

Publication

EP 0942080 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810174 A

Priority

DE 19810108 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942080A2] The machine has a holder (2) for a coil sleeve, at least one movable drive element (9) for moving the periphery of the coil (8) and a loading device (15, 17, 18) for forcing the coil and drive element together with force controlled by a controller (16) and dependent on the diameter of the coil. A signal is fed to the controller which represents the cumulative length of material delivered to the coil. The controller computes the diameter of the coil from this signal and from other signals representing the weight of the material in weight units per unit length, the specific weight of the material, the width of the coil and the diameter of the coil sleeve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/22 (2006.01); D01G 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 27/02 (2013.01); B65H 18/22 (2013.01); B65H 2404/13 (2013.01); B65H 2511/11 (2013.01); B65H 2511/14 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/11 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/14 + B65H 2220/03

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942080 A2 19990915; EP 0942080 A3 20010117; EP 0942080 B1 20030924; CN 1156621 C 20040707; CN 1229862 A 19990929; DE 19810108 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050324

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040625

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907069

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE IT

2001-09-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010716

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [K1C1] CORRECTION OF PATENT APPLICATION (TITLE PAGE) PUBLISHED

- Ref Legal Event Code: K1C1

- Effective date: 19990915

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI