Global patent index - EP 0942081 A3

EP 0942081 A3 2000-04-12 - Individual-spindle-drive type textile machine

Title (en)

Individual-spindle-drive type textile machine

Title (de)

Textilmaschine mit Einzelspindelantrieb

Title (fr)

Machine textile avec broche à entraînement individuel

Publication

EP 0942081 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99103458 A

Priority

  • JP 6235998 A
  • JP 8092798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942081A2] The present invention provides a individual-spindle-drive type textile machine capable of operating upon power stoppage to use simple control means to decelerate and stop a spindle drive system and a drum drive system synchronously. The present invention provides an individual-spindle-drive type textile machine 7 for a multi-twister 1 using inverters 42 and 45 to drive a plurality of spindle drive motors 6 provided for the respective spindles and a winding drum drive motor 4 common to the plurality of spindle units, respectively. The individual-spindle-drive type textile machine 7 has a power stoppage means 34 for detecting power stoppage when the voltage decreases by a specified value or larger, stop instruction means 35, 46, 44, and 51 for outputting a stop instruction to each of the inverters 42 and 45, and stopping means 42 and 9 for providing feedback control in such a way as to stop each of the motors 4 and 6 within a predetermined time period based on said stop instruction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/244; D01H 1/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/244 (2006.01); D01H 1/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/32 (2013.01); D01H 1/244 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5196769 A 19930323 - CHIBA HIROSHI [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0806501 A2 19971112 - HATTORI MOTONOBU [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 425 (C - 0982) 7 September 1992 (1992-09-07)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 096, no. 007 31 July 1996 (1996-07-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942081 A2 19990915; EP 0942081 A3 20000412; EP 0942081 B1 20040526; CN 1229863 A 19990929; CN 1322188 C 20070620; DE 69917517 D1 20040701; DE 69917517 T2 20050630; DE 69932961 D1 20061005; DE 69932961 T2 20070510; EP 1460155 A1 20040922; EP 1460155 B1 20060823

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150223

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69917517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69917517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69917517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071030

2006-08-09 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050225

2005-04-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050225

2005-02-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69917517

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020719

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI