Global Patent Index - EP 0942082 A3

EP 0942082 A3 2001-05-16 - Weft tensioning and detecting device for jet looms

Title (en)

Weft tensioning and detecting device for jet looms

Title (de)

Schussfadenstreck- und -detektiereinrichtung für Düsenwebmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de tension et de détection de la trame pour métiers à tisser à jet d'air

Publication

EP 0942082 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103628 A

Priority

DE 19810129 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942082A2] The apparatus has a system (5,5a;6,6a) to give a selective deflection to the leading section (11a) of a correctly positioned weft (11) in the weft insertion channel (2a), forming a separate unit (1a). The system (7,7a;8,10) to guide and detect an incorrectly inserted weft (11) in the insertion channel (2a) forms a second and separate unit (1b), with a single weft monitor (10) for both. The apparatus for detection and stretch of weft yarns, in a jet loom, has a system (5,5a;6,6a) to give a selective deflection to the leading section (11a) of a correctly positioned weft (11) in the weft insertion channel (2a), forming a separate unit (1a). The system (7,7a;8,10) to guide and detect an incorrectly inserted weft (11) in the insertion channel (2a) forms a second and separate unit (1b), which can slide along the reed stay (3) in relation to the first unit (1a). The second unit has two yarn guides (7,8) on different planes, with a single weft monitor (10) for both. A telescopic yarn guide (9) is a connection between at least the deflection guide (6) for the weft (11) at the first unit (1a) and the yarn guide (8) at the second unit (1b). The yarn guide (7) has a biconical entry (7a). A variable gap is between the exit (4a) of the yarn guide (4) and the entry (7a) into the next yarn guide (7). An incorrectly inserted weft (11) bridges the gap without guidance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/30; D03D 51/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/28 (2006.01); D03D 47/30 (2006.01); D03D 51/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/308 (2013.01); D03D 47/3073 (2013.01); D03D 51/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942082 A2 19990915; EP 0942082 A3 20010516; EP 0942082 B1 20031217; AT 256775 T 20040115; DE 19810129 A1 19990923; DE 19810129 B4 20040805; ES 2212403 T3 20040716; JP 2000248447 A 20000912; JP 3007351 B1 20000207; PT 942082 E 20040430

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100301

2010-11-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101029

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060227

2006-10-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20060825

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060225

2006-08-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060825

2006-02-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060227

2006-02-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060225

2005-02-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-20 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212403 T3

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040216

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040225

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908050 P 20040129

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010730

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI