Global Patent Index - EP 0942085 A3

EP 0942085 A3 2000-06-07 - Flat bed knitting machine

Title (en)

Flat bed knitting machine

Title (de)

Flachstrickmaschine

Title (fr)

Métier à tricoter rectiligne

Publication

EP 0942085 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101841 A

Priority

DE 19810117 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942085A2] The flatbed knitter has a needle bed carrier (14) and the machine substructure (12,13,15) formed as one unit, from a single shaped metal sheet section (11) or several sections. The sheet metal section (11) is fitted with the required drillings, openings, recesses and edge cuts before it is bent into shape. The sheet metal section (11) is stiffened by beadings and/or lateral webs, at least in zones. The machine has two vertical support plates (17,18) over the whole machine cross-section. A passage opening for the fabric is near the needle bed carrier (14), flanked by longitudinal plates which, with the body section (11), form the hollow profile of the machine (10). The hollow profile is stiffened by lateral plates. Carriers (21,22) for the component groups of the flatbed knitter are at the body plate section (11), to the left and right of the machine. The component group carriers (21,22) are castings, held to the machine (10) body by screws or pins. The machine (10) rests on two quadrilateral tubes (19,20) across the machine line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942085 A2 19990915; EP 0942085 A3 20000607; EP 0942085 B1 20040225; CN 1138883 C 20040218; CN 1228485 A 19990915; DE 19810117 A1 19990916; ES 2212396 T3 20040716; US 6170300 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060130

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060130

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2005-02-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050203

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050128

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2212396

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908609

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020731

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001019

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI