Global Patent Index - EP 0942087 A3

EP 0942087 A3 2000-06-07 - Method for making roller blinds

Title (en)

Method for making roller blinds

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Rollos

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication de stores enroulables

Publication

EP 0942087 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104866 A

Priority

  • DE 19810971 A
  • DE 19836447 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942087A2] In the production of blinds, the separate material sections (2) are produced in the required shape in a coherent fabric web (1), with an edge zone (12) to manipulate it. Separation channels (13) are worked into the material web (1) between the edge zone (12) and the edge of the material section (2) and between the material sections (2), for them to be detached from the web (1). A number of material sections (2) are formed in the material web, next to each other. The edge (21) of the material section (2) is worked into a firm bond, by the yarn structure or an applied reinforcement. The edge (21) of the material section (2) has a yarn with a lower melting point than the surrounding fabric, to be separated by heat and the fused yarn material strengthens the edge (21) of the material section. A separation row is in the channels (13) between the material sections (2), using a yarn which dissolves during subsequent fabric treatment to separate the fabric sections (2) from each other and/or the edge zone (12) of the fabric (1). The fabric sections can be worked to include a tubular pocket, to take a stiffening or guide rod along its width and/or length, at the start or end of the fabric section. The pocket can be curved, and the ends of the pocket are secured by a locking edge. Before the fabric is coated, the fabric web is hot ironed, at least at the pocket zones. The fabric web is of texturized fiber or filament material, at least at the pocket zones. The pockets have one or more interruptions and are produced using the fabric warps, without the wefts. An indent at the rod takes part of the pocket with the bonded edge, to fix the front rod in place, with an elastic clamp which closes the indent. Eyelets are worked in the edges (21) of the fabric sections (2), for blind holders, and blind mounting ribbons are worked along extensions of the section edges (21). Reinforcements are worked into the material at the mounting points. The fabric web (1) is produced on a warp knitter, with selected needles working the fabric section edges (21) and an additional weft at the edges (21). The fabric (1) can also be produced on a loom, with denser warps at the section edges (21), taken from the adjacent zones to form the separation channels (13). An Independent claim is also included for a roller blind rod, with an indent along its length, with projections at the opening into the indent. Preferred features: The fabric lock has a central recess, for compression on insertion between the projections at the indent opening. The body of the lock has a central opening to allow the body to spread outwards.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/00 (2006.01); D04B 19/00 (2006.01); D04B 21/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/00 (2013.01); D04B 21/10 (2013.01); D04B 21/20 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0241 (2013.01); D10B 2501/061 (2013.01); D10B 2503/03 (2013.01); D10B 2505/12 (2013.01); Y10S 160/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942087 A2 19990915; EP 0942087 A3 20000607; EP 0942087 B1 20040526; DE 19836447 A1 19990923; DE 19836447 B4 20060511; DE 59909550 D1 20040701; US 2001013376 A1 20010816; US 6212913 B1 20010410; US 6474395 B2 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PAN-DUR HOLDING GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59909550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-12-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59909550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE CANZLER & BERGMEIER PARTNERSCHA, DE

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-05-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-09-06 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040826

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909550

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

2004-05-26 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040526

2004-05-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040526

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021029

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT NL SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI