Global Patent Index - EP 0942088 A3

EP 0942088 A3 2000-11-15 - Suction device

Title (en)

Suction device

Title (de)

Absaugeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'aspiration

Publication

EP 0942088 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104602 A

Priority

  • DE 19810073 A
  • DE 19830346 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942088A2] The suction cleaner, to remove fluff and lint from a flatbed knitter, has a suction jet mounted to a knitting head which is connected to a vacuum generator to extract air and fluff together. A sealing connector links the suction jet to the vacuum source with a suction channel (21) and a moving sealing head along the suction channel together with the knitting head or suction jet. The suction channel (21) has elastic and tensed sealing lips (25,25') in a sealing direction, which are opened in sections by the sealing head to link the suction channel (21) to the suction jet. The suction channel (21) has a slit (23), with the sealing lips (25,25') at its edges (24,24') with one of their ends, and their other ends (27,27') lie against each other. Atmospheric pressure bears on the sealing lips (25,25') in the sealing direction when the vacuum source is operated. The sealing head has longitudinal slides, along the line of the suction channel (21), with pointed ends. The sealing lips (25,25') lie against the outer surfaces. One end of the slide is round a channel line section, and the other end is connected to the suction jet. The sealing head and the suction jet form a component unit at the knitter head in a stiff and vibration-resistant assembly. The sealing lips (25,25') and/or the slides are of a low wear and low friction material, or they are coated with it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942088 A2 19990915; EP 0942088 A3 20001115

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-09-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI