Global Patent Index - EP 0942089 A3

EP 0942089 A3 2000-03-29 - Device for reverse stitching together the lining and face fabric of necktie tail ends

Title (en)

Device for reverse stitching together the lining and face fabric of necktie tail ends

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum linksseitigen Vernähen von aus Futterstoff und Deckstoff bestehenden Krawattenspitzen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour coudre à l'envers le tissu face et l'entoilage des pointes de cravates

Publication

EP 0942089 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104327 A

Priority

  • DE 29809482 U
  • DE 29804084 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6082280A] A tie-tipping apparatus has a base plate formed with a throughgoing stitch slot having relative to a longitudinal centerline a pair of symmetrically angled end-seam sections meeting at the centerline and a pair of side-seam sections extending generally parallel to the centerline, symmetrically flanking the centerline, and crossing the respective end-seam sections. Respective positioning plates juxtaposed with the end-seam sections are adapted to press a piece of liner fabric and a piece of finish fabric against the base plate and are each movable generally transversely of the respective end-seam sections between a rear position longitudinally rearward of the respective end-seam sections and an advanced position advanced longitudinally forward and extending over the respective end-seam sections. An actuator connected between the base plate and the positioning plates can displace the positioning plates from their rear positions to their advanced positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 39/00; A41D 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 25/16 (2006.01); A41D 25/00 (2006.01); D05B 23/00 (2006.01); D05B 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05B 39/00 (2013.01); A41D 25/001 (2013.01); D10B 2501/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6082280 A 20000704; EP 0942089 A2 19990915; EP 0942089 A3 20000329; JP H11290564 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020613

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 05B 39/00 A, 7A 41D 25/00 B

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI