Global Patent Index - EP 0942091 A3

EP 0942091 A3 2000-06-14 - Removal device for stocking fixing machine

Title (en)

Removal device for stocking fixing machine

Title (de)

Abnahmevorrichtung für Maschinen zum Fixieren von Strümpfen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'enlèvement pour machine de fixation de bas

Publication

EP 0942091 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104784 A

Priority

IT BO980144 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942091A2] A removal device for machines for fixing stockings, which include a carousel (2) on which pairs of supports (3) are peripherally distributed, to support respective stockings. The removal device includes a guiding means (41) which is arranged vertically and peripherally with respect to the carousel (2), at a removal station (E) of a fixing machine. A carriage (53) can move with a reciprocating motion on the guiding means (41) under the actuation of a motor unit (47) which is controlled electronically by virtue of an encoder means (49). The carriage (43) supports a gripper assembly (50) provided with a clamp-type gripper means (51) which is suitable to grip the stockings fitted on the supports (3) in order to remove the stockings from the supports (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 5/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942091 A2 19990915; EP 0942091 A3 20000614; IT 1299892 B1 20000404; IT BO980144 A1 19990913; IT BO980144 D0 19980311

INPADOC legal status


2001-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI