Global patent index - EP 0942112 A3

EP 0942112 A3 2000-02-23 - Weatherstrips for the joining between roof covering elements

Title (en)

Weatherstrips for the joining between roof covering elements

Title (de)

Abdichtungsstreifen für Anschlüsse an Bauteilen im Dachbereich

Title (fr)

Bandes d'étanchéité pour raccordement entre éléments de toiture

Publication

EP 0942112 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102893 A

Priority

DE 29804503 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942112A2] This new flashing strip (12) is especially used for roofing structures. It can be formed to the surface contours (10, 11) and bonds with its underside to these surfaces. The strip is reinforced for permanent deformation. In this novel strip, plastic fibres (19) are employed for this purpose. Preferably, the strip contains an embedded fibrous fabric. The fibres are polyester. Fibres have specified strength and the strip has weather- and ultraviolet light resistance. The strip is wavy and has a protective coating containing polyester fibres.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/36 (2006.01); E04D 13/147 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/1475 (2013.01); E04D 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804503 U1 19980618; EP 0942112 A2 19990915; EP 0942112 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2001-07-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010111

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHUERMANN, WOLFRAM

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE IT NL

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000203

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 04D 13/14 A, 7E 04D 5/10 B, 7E 04D 5/02 B

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAUSPROFI BAUSYSTEME GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE IT NL

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI