Global Patent Index - EP 0942113 A3

EP 0942113 A3 2001-12-12 - Safety assembly for roofs or building roofings in general

Title (en)

Safety assembly for roofs or building roofings in general

Title (de)

Sicherheitsanlage für Dächer

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour toiture

Publication

EP 0942113 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99102891 A

Priority

IT MI980149 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942113A2] A safety assembly which can be installed on roofs or coverings of buildings in general, comprises at least an element consisting of one portion (1) for the fixing of the same element to the roof, a portion having at least one part (2) projecting above the surface of the roof, as well as means (22) for hooking up one or more accident-prevention devices. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 15/00; A62B 1/04; E04G 21/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/04 (2006.01); E04G 21/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 35/0056 (2013.01); A62B 35/0068 (2013.01); E04G 21/3261 (2013.01); E04G 21/3276 (2013.01); E04G 21/3295 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942113 A2 19990915; EP 0942113 A3 20011212; IT 243835 Y1 20020306; IT MI980149 U1 19990909

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050126

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-09-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-07-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020513

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 15/00 A, 7E 04G 21/32 B, 7A 62B 1/04 B

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI