Global Patent Index - EP 0942115 A3

EP 0942115 A3 2000-08-09 - A system of flexible and reversible decoration

Title (en)

A system of flexible and reversible decoration

Title (de)

System zur flexiblen und reversiblen Raumgestaltung

Title (fr)

Système de décoration modulable et reversible

Publication

EP 0942115 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102488 A

Priority

DE 19810254 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942115A2] The floor plate (50) comprises at least two superimposed, interconnected fibre plates of different rigidity which can possibly connected by means of sheets. A ceiling system (60) is provided with at least one band or plate-shaped support installation (70) for fitting to a ceiling (110). On the support installation are spaced apart height-adjustable holding devices (80) for support of a ceiling plate (90). The system also has a multi-functional support device (100) for fixture between a floor and a ceiling, which has two rod-shaped supports pushable one in the other and fixable to one another and several fixture components, particularly for fitting dividing walls.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 15/024; E04B 2/82; E04B 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/82 (2006.01); E04B 9/20 (2006.01); E04F 15/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/20 (2013.01); E04B 2/824 (2013.01); E04F 15/02476 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942115 A2 19990915; EP 0942115 A3 20000809; DE 19861050 A1 19990923; DE 19861051 A1 19991007; DE 19861051 C2 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060208

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI