Global Patent Index - EP 0942121 B1

EP 0942121 B1 2001-02-28 - Escutcheon for a door fitting

Title (en)

Escutcheon for a door fitting

Title (de)

Rosette für einen Türbeschlag

Title (fr)

Rosette pour ferrure de porte

Publication

EP 0942121 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119512 A

Priority

DE 19809251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942121A1] A disc-shaped installation base (10) can be anchored to the door, with which the basic body (12) can be brought into engagement on a locating surface and is firmly connectable via connecting devices (34, 14). The installation base formed as a ring disc has a central breakthrough for an operating component (82) of the door fixture. The installation base has preferably two eccentric axial through fixture holes for accommodation of fixture screws (58). The central breakthrough of the installation base has an elliptical periphery and the fixture holes are arranged laterally from the central breakthrough on its smaller elliptical axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 3/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 15/02 (2013.01); E05B 3/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942121 A1 19990915; EP 0942121 B1 20010228; AT 199430 T 20010315; DE 19809251 A1 19990909

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800495

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-05

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

2001-02-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 199430

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991021

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR GB IT LU NL

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI