Global Patent Index - EP 0942140 A3

EP 0942140 A3 2000-07-19 - A clip for fastening a glazing bead to a window frame, such a glazing bead, a method for fastening the glazing bead and use of the clip and the glazing bead

Title (en)

A clip for fastening a glazing bead to a window frame, such a glazing bead, a method for fastening the glazing bead and use of the clip and the glazing bead

Title (de)

Befestigungsklammer für Glashalteleiste in einem Fensterrahmen, diese Glashalteleiste, Befestigungsverfahren dieser Glashalteleiste und Verwendung der Klammer und Glashalteleiste

Title (fr)

Attache pour la fixation de parcloses dans un cadre de fenêtre, ladite parclose, méthode de fixation de la parclose et l' utilisation de l' attache et de la parclose

Publication

EP 0942140 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104791 A

Priority

DK 32998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942140A2] The invention concerns a clip for securing a glazing bead (12) to a window frame (10) and such a glazing bead. The invention also concerns a method for mounting the glazing bead (12) to the clip. The clip is provided with first tongues (2) and second tongues (7) intended for engaging a first groove (23) and a second groove (24) in the glazing bead (12). The invention is distinguished by it being possible to mount the glazing bead (12) to the window frame (10) by moving the glazing bead (12) inward against a glass pane perpendicular to the plane of the glass pane. This means that it is possible with the same system, even with the last glazing beads (12), to assemble these in a mitre joint with adjacent glazing beads (12) at the ends of the glazing bead. Furthermore, the security against burglary through the glass pane is considerably increased as it by and large is impossible to remove the glazing bead without destroying the glazing bead (12) and removing the clips. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/54 (2006.01); E06B 3/58 (2006.01); E06B 5/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5481 (2013.01); E06B 3/5821 (2013.01); E06B 5/116 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942140 A2 19990915; EP 0942140 A3 20000719; EP 0942140 B1 20020612; AT 219207 T 20020615; DE 69901742 D1 20020718; DE 69901742 T2 20030306; DK 174474 B1 20030407; DK 32999 A 19990911

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090311

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090310

2010-01-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090310

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-12-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: WINCLICK A/S

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2002-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-09-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020912

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901742 20020718

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219207 T 20020615

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI