Global patent index - EP 0942141 A3

EP 0942141 A3 2000-08-23 - Corner assembly for a frame

Title (en)

Corner assembly for a frame

Title (de)

Eckverbindung für einen Rahmen

Title (fr)

Assemblage d'angle pour un cadre

Publication

EP 0942141 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99301813 A

Priority

  • EP 99301813 A
  • EP 98200762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942141A2] A nodal assembly (11) for connecting at least two adjacent frame members (3,5) of a perimeter frame (1), the nodal assembly comprising a central portion (50) having parallel first (52) and second (54) sides and an opening (56A) in the second side, a first leg extending from the central portion in a first direction parallel to the first side and having a cavity within it in communication with the opening, a second leg extending from the central portion in a second direction different from the first direction but also parallel to the first side, and a retainer (21) slidably received in the cavity and movable between a retracted position substantially within the central portion and the first leg and an extended position in which the retainer extends substantially outwardly of the opening in the second side of the central portion and away from the second side. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/96; E06B 9/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/964 (2006.01); E06B 9/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/9647 (2013.01); E06B 9/52 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942141 A2 19990915; EP 0942141 A3 20000823; EP 0942141 B1 20021030

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160310

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-02-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69903680

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-05

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020118

2001-05-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT NL

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010104

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT NL

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI