Global Patent Index - EP 0942149 B1

EP 0942149 B1 2000-08-16 - Sealing ring for the vanes of a turbomachine stage

Title (en)

Sealing ring for the vanes of a turbomachine stage

Title (de)

Dichtring für die Schaufeln einer Turbomaschinenstufe

Title (fr)

Joint d'étanchéité pour les aubes d'un étage de turbomachine

Publication

EP 0942149 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400577 A

Priority

FR 9803036 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942149A1] The seal for turbine blade roots (9) fitting in an annular channel (10) of a disc (2) with plates (8) consists of flat sections (18) set between the plate and the outer surface (16) of the disc. Extensions (26) fit against the oblique upper surfaces (30) of the disc channel. The flat sections and extensions have interlocking slits to form a crossing joint (27) between two parts of a seal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/30; F01D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/006 (2013.01); F01D 5/3038 (2013.01); F05D 2250/141 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942149 A1 19990915; EP 0942149 B1 20000816; DE 69900008 D1 20000921; DE 69900008 T2 20010405; FR 2776012 A1 19990917; FR 2776012 B1 20000407; JP H11315703 A 19991116; US 6332617 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060310

2006-02-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2005-02-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050225

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-25 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2002-01-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900008 20000921

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SNECMA MOTEURS

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000126

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990329

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI