Global Patent Index - EP 0942163 A3

EP 0942163 A3 2000-09-27 - Process for the synchronisation of a multi-cylinder internal-combustion engine

Title (en)

Process for the synchronisation of a multi-cylinder internal-combustion engine

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Synchronisation einer mehrzylindrigen Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la synchronisation d'un moteur à combustion interne à plusieurs cylindres

Publication

EP 0942163 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123719 A

Priority

DE 19810214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942163A2] The method involves performing a new provisional synchronization shifted by a predefined angle if a revolution rate increase does not occur, triggering a fuel injection for a cylinder assumed to be at top dead center and verifying the provisional synchronization with an increase in revolution rate. The predefinable shift in the early synchronization is 360 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/36; F02D 41/06; F02D 41/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/22 (2006.01); F02D 41/34 (2006.01); F02D 41/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/009 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 2041/0092 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942163 A2 19990915; EP 0942163 A3 20000927; EP 0942163 B1 20040324; DE 19810214 A1 19990916; DE 19810214 B4 20090917; JP H11294236 A 19991026; US 2002005063 A1 20020117; US 6415655 B2 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-02 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-04-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081227

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-10-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20041223

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AG CT IP SV

2005-02-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SIEMENS AGCT IP SV

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-12-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040708

2004-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811055 P 20040429

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030409

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010327

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI