Global Patent Index - EP 0942166 A3

EP 0942166 A3 2000-03-22 - Multicylinder engine with exhaust gas recirculation

Title (en)

Multicylinder engine with exhaust gas recirculation

Title (de)

Mehrzylindrige Brennkraftmaschine mit Abgasrückführung

Title (fr)

Moteur à plusieurs cylindres avec recirculation de gaz d'échappement

Publication

EP 0942166 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102586 A

Priority

DE 19810840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942166A2] The recirculation channels (6) of at least two neighboring cylinders are combined in a modular exhaust recirculation unit (10). The control valves (7) located in the channels, are also contained in the chamber, and are actuated together. The exhaust is fed via an intake opening into a distribution chamber (11) in the unit. The recirculation channels leading to the cylinder intake channels branch off the chamber. The recirculation channel intakes (8) are sealed by the control valves, which are formed as sealing cones.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07; F02B 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01); F02B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/67 (2016.02); F02M 26/21 (2016.02); F02M 26/38 (2016.02); F02M 26/42 (2016.02); F02M 26/54 (2016.02); F02B 2031/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XA] DE 19631337 A1 19980205 - AUDI AG [DE]
  • [XA] EP 0701048 A1 19960313 - FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 16, no. 363 (M - 1290) 5 August 1992 (1992-08-05)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 034 (M - 1544) 19 January 1994 (1994-01-19)
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 465 (M - 1665) 30 August 1994 (1994-08-30)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942166 A2 19990915; EP 0942166 A3 20000322; EP 0942166 B1 20030502; DE 19810840 A1 19990916

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070211

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060211

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060211

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050210

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2004-03-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905275 P 20030605

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 25/07 A, 7F 02B 31/08 B

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI