Global Patent Index - EP 0942171 A3

EP 0942171 A3 2000-02-09 - Double diaphragm pump

Title (en)

Double diaphragm pump

Title (de)

Doppelmembranpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à membrane double

Publication

EP 0942171 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201777 A

Priority

  • EP 97302476 A
  • US 1565096 P
  • US 83723797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942171A2] An air operated double diaphragm pump 10 is provided with an air valve assembly which allows the valve cup 38 to move in a rectangular pattern which greatly reduces the cost and number of parts required for such an air valve. The main housing 12 of the pump 10 is mounted on a fluid base 20 to which the lines of fluid are attached. This allows removal of the pump for servicing by undoing several basic fasteners such as nuts and bolts 18 without requiring removal of the fluid fittings to the base 20. Thus, in the event of a pump malfunction, the pump may be easily replaced while the fluid fittings remain intact. Provision is also made for additional passages 54, 56 into each air chamber 44, 46 for operation via an externally operated solenoid valve. A one-piece check valve 26 construction is utilised with the part having a central sealing disk 26A having a plurality of radially axially extending guide members 26B extending therefrom wherein each of the guide members has an outer diameter sized to slidingly fit within a cylindrical cavity 28 and each of the guide members 26B having axially opposite the sealing disk 26A a plurality of spring loaded fingers 26D which serve to bias the check valve 26 into a closed position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/073; F04B 9/135; F16K 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/135 (2006.01); F04B 43/073 (2006.01); F04B 53/16 (2006.01); F04B 53/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/135 (2013.01); F04B 43/0736 (2013.01); F04B 53/16 (2013.01); F04B 53/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942171 A2 19990915; EP 0942171 A3 20000209; EP 0942171 B1 20030702

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100411

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091019

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091005

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69723290 P 20030807

2003-07-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0801228 P

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020904

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 43/073 A, 7F 04B 9/135 B, 7F 16K 15/02 B

1999-09-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990702

1999-09-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 801228

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT