Global Patent Index - EP 0942226 A3

EP 0942226 A3 2000-06-07 - Lighting device and lighting system using such device

Title (en)

Lighting device and lighting system using such device

Title (de)

Beleuchtungseinrichtung und Beleuchtungssystem mit einer solchen Einrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' éclairage et système d' éclairage avec un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 0942226 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104224 A

Priority

IT TO980216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942226A2] There is described a lighting device (1) substantially comprising a support structure (3) at least partially composed of transparent material; at least two lighting means (5) arranged inside the structure (3), and electrically supplied and activated each one independently from the others; a separator and reflecting member (7), contained inside the support structure (3), adapted to mutually separate the lighting means (5), and further adapted to selectively reflect to the outside of the device (1) the light coming from the lighting means (5). A lighting device comprising such device (1) is further described. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21S 8/08; F21V 7/12; F21V 21/30; F21V 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21V 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 23/04 (2013.01); F21S 8/083 (2013.01); F21V 7/005 (2013.01); F21V 23/0442 (2013.01); F21W 2131/109 (2013.01); F21Y 2113/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942226 A2 19990915; EP 0942226 A3 20000607; EP 0942226 B1 20021030; DE 69903682 D1 20021205; DE 69903682 T2 20030612; ES 2182415 T3 20030301; IT TO980216 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040304

2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-03-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040304

2004-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030303

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182415 T3

2003-02-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030129

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903682 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/08 A, 7F 21V 7/00 B, 7F 21V 23/04 B, 7F 21V 21/30 B, 7F 21W 131:109 Z, 7F 21Y 103:00 Z

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 21S 8/08 A, 7F 21V 7/12 B, 7F 21V 23/04 B, 7F 21V 21/30 B, 7F 21W 131:109 Z, 7F 21Y 103:00 Z

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI