Global Patent Index - EP 0942401 A3

EP 0942401 A3 2000-08-30 - Method and device for signalling security in traffic light control systems

Title (en)

Method and device for signalling security in traffic light control systems

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Signalsicherung in Systemen mit Wechselverkehrszeichengebern

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour la fiabilité du signal dans les agencements de feu de signalisation

Publication

EP 0942401 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104966 A

Priority

DE 19811082 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942401A2] The method involves transferring a demand state of a currently selected display (3) from a central unit (6) to an associated control element (4), which passes it to the display, determines the current actual state of the display and transfers it to all control elements and the central unit. Each control element and the central unit compare the actual state of the selected display with displayed actual states of the other displays. The control elements and/or central unit, which detect a conflict between the actual states of at least two displays, transfer a command to switch off the control elements associated with these displays, which switch the displays to a safe state.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/07 (2006.01); G08G 1/095 (2006.01); G08G 1/097 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/07 (2013.01); G08G 1/095 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942401 A2 19990915; EP 0942401 A3 20000830; EP 0942401 B1 20040922; AT 277394 T 20041015; DE 59910549 D1 20041028; DK 0942401 T3 20050124

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100312

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-12-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SIEMENS A.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910549 P 20041028

2004-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI NL

2004-04-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SIGNAL SAFETY IN TRAFFIC LIGHT CONTROL SYSTEMS

2001-05-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK LI NL

2001-04-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08G 1/07 A, 7G 08G 1/097 B

2000-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK LI NL

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI