Global Patent Index - EP 0942444 A3

EP 0942444 A3 2000-04-12 - Hermetically sealed keyboard

Title (en)

Hermetically sealed keyboard

Title (de)

Hermetisch abgeschlossene Tastatur

Title (fr)

Clavier scellé hermétiquement

Publication

EP 0942444 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99102558 A

Priority

IT TO980212 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942444A2] A hermetically sealed keyboard has a thin outer metallic foil (18) which continuously covers the area of the keys to seal it hermetically; the foil (18) is of a thickness and shape of such as to be elastically flexible at least in correspondence to each of the keys (10) for the activation of the same. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2209/07 (2013.01); H01H 2223/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942444 A2 19990915; EP 0942444 A3 20000412; IT TO980212 A1 19990913

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI