Global Patent Index - EP 0942491 A3

EP 0942491 A3 2000-11-02 - Sealed electrical connector with secondary locking member

Title (en)

Sealed electrical connector with secondary locking member

Title (de)

Abgedichteter elektrischer Verbinder mit Sekundärverriegelungsmitteln

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique étanche avec éléments de verrouillage secondaires

Publication

EP 0942491 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99104345 A

Priority

  • EP 99104345 A
  • EP 98400600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0942491A2] An electrical connector (2) with coupling assist member (10) and secondary locking member (8) is provided with a seal (64) mounted to the secondary locking member (8). The secondary locking member has camming protrusions (42) that are cammed below a camming surface (76) of the coupling assist member during transverse sliding thereof, such that the seal is partially compressed prior to full mating with a complementary connector. This also simplifies assembly of the seal in the connector and reduces the number of separate parts to be handled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/436; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01); H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62911 (2013.01); H01R 13/4364 (2013.01); H01R 13/5219 (2013.01); H01R 13/62927 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0942491 A2 19990915; EP 0942491 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030812

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030401

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-09-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI