Global Patent Index - EP 0942760 A4

EP 0942760 A4 2000-10-18 - FLUID COLLECTION DEVICE WITH RETRACTABLE NEEDLE

Title (en)

FLUID COLLECTION DEVICE WITH RETRACTABLE NEEDLE

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSSAMMELVORRICHTUNG MIT EINZIEHBARER NADEL

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE PRELEVEMENT DE LIQUIDE A AIGUILLE RETRACTABLE

Publication

EP 0942760 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97950809 A

Priority

  • US 9722156 W
  • US 76108896 A
  • US 4711097 P
  • US 6534897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9824493A1] This invention discloses a needle retraction mechanism for a needle bearing medical device wherein a needle retaining member (31) is bonded directly to the needle (15) for selective holding of the needle (15) in a projecting configuration from the device. The needle retaining member (31) has an axial extension configured to provide at least one finger, and preferably a plurality of separable fingers (47) that are jointed about a bore. Mutual engagement between the fingers and the needle can be enhanced by adhesive or thermal bonding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/32; A61B 5/14; A61M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/32 (2006.01); A61B 5/15 (2006.01); A61M 5/158 (2006.01); A61M 25/06 (2006.01); A61M 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 25/0631 (2013.01); A61B 5/15003 (2013.01); A61B 5/150213 (2013.01); A61B 5/150267 (2013.01); A61B 5/150305 (2013.01); A61B 5/150389 (2013.01); A61B 5/150473 (2013.01); A61B 5/150519 (2013.01); A61B 5/150572 (2013.01); A61B 5/150587 (2013.01); A61B 5/150656 (2013.01); A61B 5/150717 (2013.01); A61B 5/150732 (2013.01); A61B 5/154 (2013.01); A61M 5/3202 (2013.01); A61M 5/3232 (2013.01); A61M 25/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9824493 A1 19980611; AU 5370898 A 19980629; CA 2273488 A1 19980611; CA 2273488 C 20070130; EP 0942760 A1 19990922; EP 0942760 A4 20001018; JP 2002510984 A 20020409; JP 2008100111 A 20080501; JP 4106446 B2 20080625

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20061009

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030304

2000-10-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61M 5/32 A, 7A 61B 5/14 B, 7A 61M 5/00 B

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990705

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE