Global patent index - EP 0942796 B1

EP 0942796 B1 2000-05-10 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISCONTINUOUS PARTING OFF OF MOLTEN MASS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DISCONTINUOUS PARTING OFF OF MOLTEN MASS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM DISKONTINUIERLICHEN ABSTECHEN VON SCHMELZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA DIVISION EN DISCONTINU DE MATIERES EN FUSION

Publication

EP 0942796 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97911179 A

Priority

  • DE 19641169 A
  • EP 9705469 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9815374A1] A method and device for discontinuous parting off of molten mass out of a vessel through a passage should be operationally reliable. Molten mass flow in the passage (2) or in the direction of flow behind the passage (2) is interrupted and hardened by cooling. For renewed parting, interruption element (4) is opened and the solidified molten mass is melted once again by supplying radial electromagnetic energy (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/14 (2006.01); B22D 41/60 (2006.01); H05B 6/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/108 (2013.01); B22D 41/14 (2013.01); B22D 41/60 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9815374 A1 19980416; AT 192681 T 20000515; AU 4865297 A 19980505; DE 19641169 C1 19980528; EP 0942796 A1 19990922; EP 0942796 B1 20000510; ES 2148947 T3 20001016; JP 2001501539 A 20010206; KR 20000048580 A 20000725; US 6210629 B1 20010403

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2003-03-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20020723

2003-01-08 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20020723

2003-01-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20020723

2002-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011219

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-23 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-23 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-23 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011023

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011017

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-05 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011005

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: PECHINEY

2001-04-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: PECHINEY

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148947

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-08-10 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701674

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192681

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991011

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990510

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE