Global Patent Index - EP 0942807 B1

EP 0942807 B1 2000-08-23 - SCREWDRIVER OR SCREWDRIVER ATTACHMENT

Title (en)

SCREWDRIVER OR SCREWDRIVER ATTACHMENT

Title (de)

SCHRAUBENDREHER ODER SCHRAUBENDREHEREINSATZ

Title (fr)

TOURNEVIS OU EMBOUT TOURNEVIS

Publication

EP 0942807 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952010 A

Priority

  • DE 29621122 U
  • DE 29715772 U
  • EP 9706661 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6520055B1] The invention relates to a screwdriver or screwdriver attachment (S) comprising one input and one output end (1 and 2) and a shank (4) located in between the two. The output end has at least three, preferably four, ribs (7) which radiate outwards from a central section (8) located around the axis of rotation (x-x). The ribs (7) on each end side have a face, which is placed at an angle to the axis of rotation, and flanks on the front and back side (13, 14) which run substantially parallel to each other in the area next to the frontal face (11). In this area the flank (13) on the front side is located on a diametrical surface (diameter D-D) in relation to the axis of rotation (x-x), whereby the flanks (13, 14) of adjoining ribs (7) form a groove (9) which runs lengthways and whose root (16) ends in the outer surface of a section of the shank. The invention provides a solution that is more balanced in terms of load and easier to use, by having flanks (13, 14) that are curved in such a way that they point away from each other in the direction of the axis, starting from the face area of each rib (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 15/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6520055 B1 20030218; CN 1073000 C 20011017; CN 1245454 A 20000223; EP 0942807 A1 19990922; EP 0942807 B1 20000823; WO 9824597 A1 19980611

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170601

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-07-05 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161201

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702255

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151111

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051129

2002-07-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011129

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702255 20000928

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991020

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990531

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE