Global Patent Index - EP 0942812 B1

EP 0942812 B1 2002-11-20 - SCISSORS

Title (en)

SCISSORS

Title (de)

SCHERE

Title (fr)

CISEAUX

Publication

EP 0942812 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96928512 A

Priority

  • GB 9602022 W
  • GB 9517125 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9707944A1] A hand held cutting tool comprises first and second elongate blades (11) movably connected together so that they are oppositely faced. At least one of the blades is provided with a cutting edge (14) and a guard portion (10) adjacent the cutting edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 29/04; B26B 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/06 (2006.01); B26B 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 29/04 (2013.01); B26B 13/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9707944 A1 19970306; DE 69624950 D1 20030102; DE 69624950 T2 20030821; EP 0942812 A1 19990922; EP 0942812 B1 20021120; ES 2185795 T3 20030501; GB 9517125 D0 19951025

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150821

2016-09-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160927

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150820

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150820

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69624950

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-11-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140827

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120820

2012-02-08 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: MARTOR KG

- Effective date: 20120127

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MARTOR KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WARD, JEREMY LUKE, SHEFFIELD, GB

- Document: DE 69624950

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-11-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69624950

- Representative's name: ROCHE, VON WESTERNHAGEN & EHRESMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20110921

2011-09-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69624950

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE OSTRIGA, SONNET, WIRTHS & ROCHE, DE

2010-12-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101118 AND 20101124

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185795 T3

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624950 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

1999-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990927

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980317

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT