Global Patent Index - EP 0942870 B1

EP 0942870 B1 2000-12-20 - VACUUM AND GAS-FLUSH PACKAGING DEVICE FOR FILLED POUCHES

Title (en)

VACUUM AND GAS-FLUSH PACKAGING DEVICE FOR FILLED POUCHES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM EVAKUIEREN UND BEGASEN VON GEFÜLLTEN PACKUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE CONDITIONNEMENT SOUS VIDE ET SOUS GAZ DE PAQUETS REMPLIS

Publication

EP 0942870 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97909132 A

Priority

  • DE 9702065 W
  • DE 29619396 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9821099A1] Disclosed is a vacuum packaging and buffer gas-flushing device for a pouch, which comprises a two-part vacuum chamber (11) in which a parallelepiped gas-flushing pipe (21) is installed above the opening (3) of the pouch-package (1). On the lower portion (22) of said pipe (21), slot-like gas inlets (23) are arranged parallel to each other and at a right angle relative to the pouch (1) opening (3). The inventive device (10) advantageously enables, regardless of the precise position of the pouch (1) opening (3) downstream of the gas-flushing pipe (21), vacuum to be obtained up to a point where only some oxygen residue remains inside the pouch (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 31/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29619396 U1 19980305; BR 9713336 A 20000509; EP 0942870 A1 19990922; EP 0942870 B1 20001220; ES 2153652 T3 20010301; JP 2001504064 A 20010327; WO 9821099 A1 19980522

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040914

2005-09-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050913

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040914

2004-09-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-05-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-09-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030914

2003-08-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-03-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153652

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702795

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-25

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990608

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE