Global Patent Index - EP 0942889 B1

EP 0942889 B1 2001-12-19 - WINDER FOR ROLLING SHEETS OF MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY FOR WINDING PAPER OR CARDBOARD SHEETS INTO REELS

Title (en)

WINDER FOR ROLLING SHEETS OF MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY FOR WINDING PAPER OR CARDBOARD SHEETS INTO REELS

Title (de)

WICKELMASCHINE ZUM AUFWICKELN EINER MATERIALBAHN, INSBESONDERE EINER PAPIER- ODER KARTONBAHN ZU EINER WICKELROLLE

Title (fr)

BOBINEUSE POUR ENROULER UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU, NOTAMMENT UNE BANDE DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON POUR FORMER UN ROULEAU BOBINE

Publication

EP 0942889 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952756 A

Priority

  • DE 19649354 A
  • EP 9706111 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19649354A1] To roll paper or cardboard sheets (1) into reels (3) known winders have devices to turn the reel (3) and generate tension along the sheet (1) during rolling, as well as a contact roll (4, 19) that contacts the reel (3) under pressure. The contact roll (4, 19) together with the reel (3) forms a nip through which the sheet (1) is fed towards the reel (3). According to the invention, so as to carry at least part of the reel weight, at least one additional support reel (16, 20, 25) is placed underneath the reel (3). This support reel extends parallel to the axis of the contact roll (4, 19), is mounted in such a way that it can rotate freely or can be switched to free-wheel position, and on its outer surface has a deformable coating (18, 24) made of a cellular plastic material comprising numerous evenly distributed pores and having a compression modulus kappa of less than 10 MPa.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 27/00 (2006.01); B65H 18/08 (2006.01); B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/08 (2013.01); B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414866 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19649354 A1 19980604; DE 19649354 B4 20051103; AT 211112 T 20020115; CA 2273041 A1 19980604; CA 2273041 C 20030916; EP 0942889 A1 19990922; EP 0942889 B1 20011219; ES 2170428 T3 20020801; JP 2000512963 A 20001003; JP 3283527 B2 20020520; US 6241178 B1 20010605; WO 9823515 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061106

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-11-06 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061106

2006-11-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061105

2005-11-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051121

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-15 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20051115

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-10 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051110

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040730

2003-11-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-11-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021122

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021119

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-08-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER JAGENBERG GMBH

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170428 T3

2002-06-19 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20011219

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705919 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011219

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211112 T 20020115

2000-01-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991210

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990325

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT NL SE