Global patent index - EP 0942890 B1

EP 0942890 B1 2000-06-14 - ADAPTATION OF SECTION LENGTHS OF A PRINTING LINE

Title (en)

ADAPTATION OF SECTION LENGTHS OF A PRINTING LINE

Title (de)

LÄNGENANPASSUNG VON ABSCHNITTSLÄNGEN VON DRUCKBAHNEN

Title (fr)

ADAPTATION DES LONGUEURS DE SECTION DE BANDES A IMPRIMER

Publication

EP 0942890 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97952887 A

Priority

  • DE 19650803 A
  • EP 9706814 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19650803A1] The invention relates to a method for controlling or regulating the cycle length (P1-P4) of at least one printing line (111-114), whereby each printing line (111-114) runs along a line path (101-104) and exhibits a periodically repeating pattern having a cycle length (P1-P4) in the direction of travel of said line. To obtain a desired cycle length (P1'-P4') or a uniform cycle length (P1'-P4') at the end of the line path (101-104), the printing lines (111-114) are more or less heavily moistened at the beginning of the line paths (101-104) by moistening devices (122), thereby making it possible to funnel the printing lines (111-114) more accurately registered for further processing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/04 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 23/1886 (2013.01); B65H 23/04 (2013.01); B65H 2511/512 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1864 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2511/512 + B65H 2220/01

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19650803 A1 19980610; EP 0942890 A2 19990922; EP 0942890 B1 20000614; WO 9824720 A2 19980611; WO 9824720 A3 19980723

INPADOC legal status

2006-08-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701899

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19991116

1999-09-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990520

1999-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE